Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Friedrich Egon Cardinal von Fürstenberg

Deceased

Archbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1813Born
15 Oct 183623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc, Czech Republic
6 Jun 185339.6SelectedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
27 Jun 185339.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
4 Sep 185339.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
12 May 187965.5Elevated to Cardinal
27 Feb 188066.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
20 Aug 189278.8DiedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Egon von Fürstenberg (VIAF: 62310747)
Friedrich Egon Cardinal von Fürstenberg (born , died ) Archbishop of Olomouc

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVienna, Austria
Ordained BishopSt. Vaclav, Cathedral, Olomouc, Archdiocese of Olomouc
Buried Place (Original)St. Vaclav, Cathedral, Olomouc, Archdiocese of Olomouc

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
  • a cardinal for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 425, and Page 47
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 May 1879
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017