Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonín Ludvík Frind

Deceased

Bishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1823Born
26 Jul 184723.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Apr 187955.5SelectedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
15 May 187955.5ConfirmedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
8 Jun 187955.6Ordained BishopBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
28 Oct 188158.0DiedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Antonín Ludvík Frind (VIAF: 884933)
Bishop Antonín Ludvík Frind (born , died ) Bishop of Litoměřice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLipové, Diocese of Litoměřice
Ordained BishopPraha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 347
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017