Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adalbert Josef Lidmansky

Deceased

Bishop of Gurk, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1795Born
12 Mar 181822.9Ordained PriestPriest of ČeskÚ Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
13 May 184247.0SelectedBishop of Gurk, Austria
27 Oct 184247.5ConfirmedBishop of Gurk, Austria
30 Oct 184247.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gurk, Austria
23 Jul 185863.2DiedBishop of Gurk, Austria

MicroData Summary for Adalbert Josef Lidmansky (VIAF: 224787449)
Bishop Adalbert Josef Lidmansky (born , died ) Bishop of Gurk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeuhaus, Czech Republic
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 210
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,842, Number 61
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,320

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast