Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Thomas Joseph Cardinal Winning

Deceased

Archbishop of Glasgow, Scotland

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Andrea delle Fratte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1925BornWishaw
18 Dec 194823.5Ordained PriestPriest of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain
22 Oct 197146.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
22 Oct 197146.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lugmad
30 Nov 197146.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lugmad
23 Apr 197448.8AppointedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
26 Nov 199469.4Elevated to Cardinal
26 Nov 199469.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Andrea delle Fratte
17 Jun 200176.0DiedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Winning:
Thomas Joseph Cardinal Winning (born , died ) Archbishop of Glasgow

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
  • a cardinal for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015