Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Michael McGee

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1904Born
25 May 192924.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 195247.5AppointedBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
11 Nov 195247.9Ordained BishopBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
4 Apr 198176.3RetiredBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
5 Mar 198378.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Michael McGee
Bishop Joseph Michael McGee (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Galloway

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonzievaird and Strowan, Perthshire

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018