Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gordon Joseph Cardinal Gray

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Chiara a Vigna Clara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1910Born
15 Jun 193524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
20 Jun 195140.8AppointedArchbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
21 Sep 195141.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
12 Sep 196353.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
25 Mar 196554.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
28 Apr 196958.7Elevated to Cardinal
28 Apr 196958.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Chiara a Vigna Clara
30 May 198574.8RetiredArchbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
19 Jul 199382.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Gordon Joseph Gray
Gordon Joseph Cardinal Gray (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeith, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Ordained PriestSt Mary, Cathedral, Edinburgh, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Ordained BishopSt Mary, Cathedral, Edinburgh, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Death PlaceEdinburgh, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)St Mary, Cathedral, Edinburgh, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 41.8 years
  • a cardinal for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017