Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Protógenes José Luft, S.d.C.

Bishop of Barra do Garças, Mato Grosso, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1949 Born
7 Dec 197526.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Servants of Charity
26 Jan 200050.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Barra do Garças, Mato Grosso, Brazil
26 Mar 200050.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Barra do Garças, Mato Grosso, Brazil
23 May 200152.0SucceededBishop of Barra do Garças, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Protógenes José Luft
Bishop Protógenes José Luft S.d.C. (born ) Bishop of Barra do Garças

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalmeira das Missões

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Barra do Garças.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,741

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast