Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Mańkowski

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kamyanets-Podilskyi

Titular Archbishop of Aenus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1866BornSahinka
7 Jul 189932.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine
24 Sep 191851.8AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine
1 Dec 191852.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine
8 Dec 191953.1InstalledBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine
9 Feb 192659.2ResignedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine
9 Feb 192659.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aenus
8 Apr 193366.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Pietro Mańkowski:
Archbishop Pietro Mańkowski (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kamyanets-Podilskyi

  • a priest for 33.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015