Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Maria Cissé

Deceased

Bishop of Sikasso, Mali


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1932Born
4 Apr 195926.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jul 197643.8AppointedBishop of Sikasso, Mali
8 Jan 197744.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sikasso, Mali
3 Nov 199664.1DiedBishop of Sikasso, Mali

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Maria Cissé
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Maria Cissé (born , died ) Bishop of Sikasso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSégou

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast