Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Judes Bicaba

Deceased

Bishop of Dédougou


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1947BornWakara
12 Jul 197528.5Ordained PriestPriest of Nouna-Dédougou, Burkina Faso
14 Apr 200053.2IncardinatedPriest of Dédougou, Burkina Faso
4 Jun 200558.4AppointedBishop of Dédougou, Burkina Faso
1 Oct 200558.7Ordained BishopBishop of Dédougou, Burkina Faso
19 Aug 201669.6DiedBishop of Dédougou, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Judes Bicaba
Bishop Judes Bicaba (born 1947, died ) Bishop of Dédougou

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,983
  • d: CB, 19 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 20 Aug 2016