Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardo Díaz Vázquez

Bishop of Tacámbaro, Michoacán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1966 BornLa Angostura
26 Oct 199125.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México
1 May 199326.9Ordained PriestPriest of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México
22 Aug 201448.2AppointedBishop of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México
22 Oct 201448.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Gerardo Díaz Vázquez:
Bishop Gerardo Díaz Vázquez (born ) Bishop of Tacámbaro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tacámbaro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Aug 2014
  • od/c1: CB, 22 Aug 2014
  • ob: CB, 2 Sep 2014
  • c2+: CB, 28 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 30 Sep 2014