Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Pereira da Costa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Campina Grande, Paraiba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1915BornPocinhos
23 Mar 194024.5Ordained PriestPriest
31 May 195438.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paraíba, Paraiba, Brazil
31 May 195438.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tinum
15 Aug 195438.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tinum
20 Jun 195943.8AppointedBishop of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil
23 Aug 196246.9AppointedBishop of Campina Grande, Paraiba, Brazil
20 May 198165.7ResignedBishop of Campina Grande, Paraiba, Brazil
25 Jul 200690.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Campina Grande, Paraiba, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manuel Pereira da Costa:
Bishop Manuel Pereira da Costa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Campina Grande

  • a priest for 66.3 years
  • a bishop for 51.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013