Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luís Gonzaga Fernandes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Campina Grande, Paraiba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1926BornMarcelino Vieira
8 Dec 195024.3Ordained PriestPriest
6 Nov 196539.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil
6 Nov 196539.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mididi
5 Dec 196539.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mididi
9 Jul 198154.9AppointedBishop of Campina Grande, Paraiba, Brazil
29 Aug 200175.0RetiredBishop of Campina Grande, Paraiba, Brazil
4 Apr 200376.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Campina Grande, Paraiba, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luís Gonzaga Fernandes:
Bishop Luís Gonzaga Fernandes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Campina Grande

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Mar 2014