Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Alphonsus Ryan, S.P.S.

Bishop of Mzuzu, Malawi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1952 Born
18 Jun 197826.3Ordained PriestPriest of St. Patrick’s Society for the Foreign Missions
26 Apr 201664.1AppointedBishop of Mzuzu, Malawi
27 Aug 201664.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mzuzu, Malawi

MicroData Summary for John Alphonsus Ryan
Bishop John Alphonsus Ryan S.P.S. (born ) Bishop of Mzuzu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTipperary, Archdiocese of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
Ordained PriestHolycross, Abbey, Tipperary, Archdiocese of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
Ordained BishopMzuzu Upper Stadium, Mzuzu, Diocese of Mzuzu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mzuzu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 11 May 2016
  • c2+: CB, 9 Aug 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,085
  • c1: CB, 23 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018