Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexis Habiyambere, S.J.

Bishop Emeritus of Nyundo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Aug 1939 BornSave
1 Aug 197637.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Jan 199757.4AppointedBishop of Nyundo, Rwanda
22 Mar 199757.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nyundo, Rwanda
11 Mar 201676.6RetiredBishop of Nyundo, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Alexis Habiyambere
Bishop Alexis Habiyambere S.J. (born Aug 1939) Bishop Emeritus of Nyundo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nyundo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,942
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 May 2016