Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Smaragde Mbonyintege

Bishop of Kabgayi, Rwanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1947 Born
20 Jul 197528.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kabgayi, Rwanda
21 Jan 200658.9AppointedBishop of Kabgayi, Rwanda
26 Mar 200659.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kabgayi, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Smaragde Mbonyintege
Bishop Smaragde Mbonyintege (born ) Bishop of Kabgayi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRutobwe-Gitarama

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kabgayi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Jan 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast