Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anastase Mutabazi

Bishop Emeritus of Kabgayi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1952 BornBirenga
25 Jul 198027.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kibungo, Rwanda
13 Mar 199643.2AppointedBishop of Kabgayi, Rwanda
26 May 199643.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kabgayi, Rwanda
10 Dec 200451.9ResignedBishop of Kabgayi, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Anastase Mutabazi:
Bishop Anastase Mutabazi (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kabgayi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kabgayi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,754

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015