Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kizito Bahujimihigo

Bishop Emeritus of Kibungo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1954 BornRwamagana
25 Jul 198025.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 199743.0AppointedBishop of Ruhengeri, Rwanda
27 Jun 199843.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ruhengeri, Rwanda
28 Aug 200752.7AppointedBishop of Kibungo, Rwanda
29 Jan 201055.1ResignedBishop of Kibungo, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Kizito Bahujimihigo:
Bishop Kizito Bahujimihigo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kibungo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kibungo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Aug 2007
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,346

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013