Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonino Catarella

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Piazza Armerina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1889Born
11 Jul 191323.9Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 194252.4AppointedBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
8 Mar 194252.5Ordained BishopBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
29 Oct 197081.2RetiredBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
29 Oct 197081.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Vissalsa
8 Jan 197181.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Vissalsa
9 Dec 197283.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Piazza Armerina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonino Catarella
Bishop Antonino Catarella (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Piazza Armerina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCammarata

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast