Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Romo Gutiérrez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Torreón, Coahuila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1915BornGuadalajara
23 Mar 194024.7Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jan 195842.5AppointedBishop of Torreón, Coahuila, México
20 Apr 195842.8Ordained BishopBishop of Torreón, Coahuila, México
27 Jun 199075.0RetiredBishop of Torreón, Coahuila, México
15 Dec 200792.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Torreón, Coahuila, México

MicroData Summary for Fernando Romo Gutiérrez:
Bishop Fernando Romo Gutiérrez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Torreón

  • a priest for 67.7 years
  • a bishop for 49.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015