Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Medina Ramirez, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Prelate of El Salto, Durango, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1922Born
17 Aug 194724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
7 Dec 197351.1AppointedPrelate of El Salto, Durango, México
7 Dec 197351.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sesta
9 Mar 197451.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sesta
15 Feb 197855.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Sesta
13 Oct 198866.0DiedPrelate of El Salto, Durango, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco Medina Ramirez
Bishop Francisco Medina Ramirez O.C.D. (born , died ) Prelate of El Salto

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast