Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Evarist Pinto

Archbishop Emeritus of Karachi, Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1933 Born
6 Jan 196834.0Ordained PriestPriest of Karachi, Pakistan
17 Feb 200066.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Karachi, Pakistan
17 Feb 200066.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Castra Severiana
25 Apr 200066.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castra Severiana
20 Nov 200268.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Karachi, Pakistan
5 Jan 200470.0AppointedArchbishop of Karachi, Pakistan
25 Jan 201278.0RetiredArchbishop of Karachi, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Evarist Pinto
Archbishop Evarist Pinto (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Karachi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGoa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Karachi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,748

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast