Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Armando Trindade

Deceased

Archbishop of Lahore, Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1927Born
6 May 195022.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jul 197345.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lahore, Pakistan
5 Jul 197345.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubusuptu
7 Oct 197345.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tubusuptu
10 Jul 197547.7AppointedBishop of Lahore, Pakistan
23 Apr 199466.4AppointedArchbishop of Lahore, Pakistan
31 Jul 200072.7DiedArchbishop of Lahore, Pakistan

MicroData Summary
Armando Trindade
Archbishop Armando Trindade
(born , died )
Archbishop of Lahore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarachi
Ordained BishopOpen Air, near, Sacred Heart, Cathedral, Lahore, Diocese of Lahore

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,295
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 24, Number 1,351

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025