Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Carlos Romanin, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Río Gallegos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1954 BornSarandi
21 Dec 197824.1ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 Oct 198126.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
25 Oct 200550.9AppointedBishop of Río Gallegos, Argentina
17 Dec 200551.1Ordained BishopBishop of Río Gallegos, Argentina
18 Apr 201257.4ResignedBishop of Río Gallegos, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Juan Carlos Romanin:
Bishop Juan Carlos Romanin S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Río Gallegos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Río Gallegos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,020
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Apr 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015