Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Joseph Delplancq

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1767BornThieu
18 Jun 179124.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 182962.3AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
25 Oct 182962.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
27 Jul 183467.5DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph Delplancq:
Bishop Jean-Joseph Delplancq (born , died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 373
  • ob/c2: Google Books

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014