Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de la Croix de Castries-Mairargues

Deceased

Bishop of Vabres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1716BornUzes
22 Apr 176448.2SelectedBishop of Vabres, France
20 Aug 176448.5ConfirmedBishop of Vabres, France
9 Sep 176448.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vabres, France
6 May 179680.2DiedBishop of Vabres, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de la Croix de Castries-Mairargues:
Bishop Jean de la Croix de Castries-Mairargues (born , died ) Bishop of Vabres

  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 429
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015