Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Auguste Le Quien de La Neufville

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Acqs (Dax), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1726Born
24 Nov 177145.3SelectedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
27 Jan 177245.5ConfirmedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
1 Mar 177245.6Ordained BishopBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
24 Oct 180175.2ResignedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
28 Oct 180579.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Acqs (Dax), France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Auguste Le Quien de La Neufville
Bishop Charles-Auguste Le Quien de La Neufville (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Acqs (Dax)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBordeaux

  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 93
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast