Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Granado

Deceased

Bishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1835Born
5 Jun 185822.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Cochabamba, Bolivia
4 Dec 185823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cochabamba, Bolivia
22 Jun 186832.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
22 Jun 186832.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
30 Nov 186833.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Troas
21 Mar 187034.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
25 Aug 187136.0SucceededBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
25 Sep 189560.0DiedBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Granado
Bishop Francesco Maria Granado (born , died ) Bishop of Cochabamba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCochabamba, Diocese of Cochabamba
Ordained BishopCochabamba, Diocese of Cochabamba

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 213, and Page 568
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast