Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maximiliano Crespo Rivera

Deceased

Archbishop of Popayán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1861BornBuga
8 Sep 188523.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Oct 191049.0AppointedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
24 Feb 191149.3Ordained BishopBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
191553.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Jericó, Colombia
7 Feb 191755.3AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia
15 Nov 192362.1AppointedArchbishop of Popayán, Colombia
9 Apr 192462.5InstalledArchbishop of Popayán, Colombia
7 Nov 194079.1DiedArchbishop of Popayán, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Maximiliano Crespo Rivera:
Archbishop Maximiliano Crespo Rivera (born , died ) Archbishop of Popayán

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 59
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013