Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Edward Gelineau

Bishop Emeritus of Providence, Rhode Island, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1928 Born
5 Jun 195325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Burlington, Vermont, USA
6 Dec 197143.5AppointedBishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
26 Jan 197243.7Ordained BishopBishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
11 Jun 199769.1ResignedBishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA

MicroData Summary for Louis Edward Gelineau (VIAF: 29166668)
Bishop Louis Edward Gelineau (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Providence

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurlington, Diocese of Burlington, Vermont
Ordained BishopSts. Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Providence, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Providence.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 911

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast