Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Joseph Hines

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Norwich, Connecticut, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1912Born
19 Dec 193624.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
2 May 193724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
27 Nov 195947.2AppointedBishop of Norwich, Connecticut, USA
17 Mar 196047.5Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, Connecticut, USA
5 Jun 197562.7ResignedBishop of Norwich, Connecticut, USA
23 Apr 199077.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Norwich, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary for Vincent Joseph Hines (VIAF: 89147126)
Bishop Vincent Joseph Hines (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Norwich

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew Haven
Ordained DeaconSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSeminary St-Sulpice, Chapel, Issy-les-Moulineaux, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 16
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 Jul 2018

Quantcast