Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund Peiris, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chilaw


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1897BornChilaw
25 Feb 192426.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
12 Jan 194042.0AppointedBishop of Chilaw, Sri Lanka
25 Apr 194042.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chilaw, Sri Lanka
27 Dec 197275.0ResignedBishop of Chilaw, Sri Lanka
4 Sep 198991.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Chilaw, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Edmund Peiris:
Bishop Edmund Peiris O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chilaw

  • a priest for 65.5 years
  • a bishop for 49.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 26 Dec 2013