Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kandy

Dioecesis Kandiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 1 September 1886
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Colombo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Sri Lanka
  • Square Kilometers: 5,753 (2,222 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.kandydiocese.net/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, 873 Peradeniya Rd., Kandy 20000, Sri Lanka
  • Telephone: (081)447.16.10
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Kandy
20 April 1883ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Kandy (erected)
Diocese of Kandy
1 September 1886ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kandy Diocese of Kandy
18 December 1972Territory LostDiocese of Kandy Diocese of Badulla (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Kandy
195047,7231,473,7613.2%113748994718812ap1951
197065,0002,355,6202.8%24719568412027621ap1971
198055,8182,218,0002.5%4444886346220817ap1981
199062,6152,257,0002.8%2217391,60518819620ap1991
199979,4792,005,9564.0%3014441,80611622722ap2000
200080,5012,005,9564.0%3314471,712112222722ap2001
200183,3132,005,9564.2%3114451,85113622022ap2002
200285,3592,008,0024.3%3249811,05316920122ap2003
200385,3592,008,0024.3%3346791,08015421922ap2004
200475,4352,414,9733.1%36549083818221623ap2005
200678,9022,535,9693.1%395897813116521025ap2007
201184,8302,690,4303.2%3840781,08717618127ap2012

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013