Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Nanayakkara, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Badulla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1917BornPolgahawela
23 Dec 194225.1ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Feb 195032.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
2 Jul 195941.6AppointedBishop of Kandy, Sri Lanka
3 Oct 195941.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kandy, Sri Lanka
18 Dec 197255.1AppointedBishop of Badulla, Sri Lanka
24 Feb 197355.2InstalledBishop of Badulla, Sri Lanka
28 May 198264.5DiedBishop of Badulla, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Leo Nanayakkara:
Bishop Leo Nanayakkara O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Badulla

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 83
  • prof/i: Website of the Diocese, 19 Aug 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013