Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pranciskus Ramanauskas

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Telšiai

Titular Bishop of Carpasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1893BornBetygala
11 Jan 191723.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 194450.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Telšiai, Lithuania
28 Feb 194450.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Carpasia
9 Apr 194450.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carpasia
15 Oct 195965.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Telšiai, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Pranciskus Ramanauskas:
Bishop Pranciskus Ramanauskas (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Telšiai

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013