Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Copiapó

Dioecesis Copiapoënsis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 31 October 1957
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of La Serena
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Chile
  • Square Kilometers: 80,000 (30,900 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesisdecopiapo.cl/
  • Mailing Address: Casilla 580, Calle Chacabuco 441, Copiapo, Chile
  • Telephone: (052)21.20.90
  • Fax: 21.79.87

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Apostolic Administration of Copiapó
9 November 1946ErectedApostolic Administration of Copiapó (erected)
Territorial Prelature of Copiapó
21 April 1955ElevatedApostolic Administration of Copiapó Territorial Prelature of Copiapó
Diocese of Copiapó
31 October 1957ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Copiapó Diocese of Copiapó

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Apostolic Administration of Copiapó
195080,00084,00095.2%811194,210151812ap1951
Territorial Prelature of Copiapó
Diocese of Copiapó
1965113,600165,30868.7%1912313,664146617ap1967
1970150,000152,32698.5%219305,000118815ap1971
1976187,000220,00085.0%169257,480118718ap1977
1980188,800227,00083.2%177247,86699019ap1981
1990180,000207,40086.8%167237,826910420ap1991
1999203,000246,00082.5%197267,8072198721ap2000
2000188,623230,87381.7%226286,7362578921ap2001
2001220,590270,00081.7%218297,6062998121ap2002
2002230,770282,46181.7%199288,24129118421ap2003
2003178,035254,33670.0%2111325,56330138021ap2004
2004178,035254,33670.0%2114355,08630159521ap2005
2006193,524254,33676.1%2212345,69133139421ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Jul 2014