Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hugo Barrantes Ureña

Archbishop Emeritus of San José de Costa Rica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1936 BornSan Isidro de El General
23 Dec 196125.6Ordained PriestPriest of San Isidro de El General, Costa Rica
17 Apr 199861.9AppointedBishop of Puntarenas, Costa Rica
16 Jul 199862.2Ordained BishopBishop of Puntarenas, Costa Rica
13 Jul 200266.1AppointedArchbishop of San José de Costa Rica
4 Jul 201377.1RetiredArchbishop of San José de Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Hugo Barrantes Ureña:
Archbishop Hugo Barrantes Ureña (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of San José de Costa Rica

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of San José de Costa Rica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,356
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 May 2014