Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Javier Gerardo Román Arias

Bishop of Limón, Costa Rica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1962 Born
8 Dec 198725.1Ordained PriestPriest of San José de Costa Rica
21 Mar 201552.4AppointedBishop of Limón, Costa Rica
30 May 201552.6Ordained BishopBishop of Limón, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Javier Gerardo Román Arias
Bishop Javier Gerardo Román Arias (born ) Bishop of Limón

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlajuela

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Limón.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2015
  • ob: CB, 21 Mar 2015
  • c2: CB, 18 May 2015
  • c34: CB, 30 May 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,497

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018