Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Enrique Quirós Quirós

Bishop of Cartago, Costa Rica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1967 Born
8 Dec 199427.8Ordained PriestPriest of San José de Costa Rica
24 May 200538.3IncardinatedPriest of Cartago, Costa Rica
4 Mar 201750.1AppointedBishop of Cartago, Costa Rica
13 May 201750.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cartago, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Mario Enrique Quirós Quirós
Bishop Mario Enrique Quirós Quirós (born ) Bishop of Cartago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParaíso, Diocese of Cartago
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora del Carmen, Cathedral, Cartago, Diocese of Cartago

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cartago.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2017
  • ob: CB, 4 Mar 2017
  • c2+: CB, 8 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 May 2017