Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Eugenio Salazar Mora

Bishop of Tilarán-Liberia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1958 BornGuadalupe
4 Dec 198224.1Ordained PriestPriest of San José de Costa Rica
6 Feb 201657.3AppointedBishop of Tilarán-Liberia, Costa Rica
4 Apr 201657.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tilarán-Liberia, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Manuel Eugenio Salazar Mora
Bishop Manuel Eugenio Salazar Mora (born ) Bishop of Tilarán-Liberia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tilarán-Liberia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Feb 2016
  • ob: CB, 6 Feb 2016
  • c2: CB, 29 Mar 2016
  • c34: CB, 4 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 5 Apr 2016