Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José de Queirós Alves, C.SS.R.

Archbishop of Huambo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1941 BornSoalhães
15 Aug 196019.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Aug 196625.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
12 Sep 198645.3AppointedBishop of Menongue, Angola
23 Nov 198645.5Ordained BishopBishop of Menongue, Angola
3 May 200463.0AppointedArchbishop of Huambo, Angola
27 Jun 200463.1InstalledArchbishop of Huambo, Angola

MicroData Summary for José de Queirós Alves:
Archbishop José de Queirós Alves C.SS.R. (born ) Archbishop of Huambo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Huambo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013