Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Guillermo Eichhorn

Bishop Emeritus of Morón, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1942 Born
21 Dec 196826.4Ordained PriestPriest of Gualeguaychú, Argentina
5 Dec 199654.4AppointedBishop of Gualeguaychú, Argentina
19 Mar 199754.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gualeguaychú, Argentina
30 Nov 200462.4AppointedBishop of Morón, Argentina
12 Mar 200562.7InstalledBishop of Morón, Argentina
30 Jun 201775.0RetiredBishop of Morón, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Luis Guillermo Eichhorn
Bishop Luis Guillermo Eichhorn (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Morón

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGilbert

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Morón.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,937
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jun 2017