Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ioan Dragomir

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Maramureş (Romanian), Romania

Titular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Pamphylia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1905Born
194943.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Maramureş (Romanian), Romania
194943.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Pamphylia
6 Mar 194943.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Pamphylia
25 Apr 198579.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Maramureş (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Ioan Dragomir
Bishop Ioan Dragomir (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Maramureş

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArinis

  • a bishop for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast