Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leopoldo Teofili

Deceased

Archbishop of Lanciano e Ortona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1921Born
6 Feb 194422.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Aug 197453.1AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano e Ortona, Italy
15 Sep 197453.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano e Ortona, Italy
22 Dec 198160.4DiedArchbishop of Lanciano e Ortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo Teofili
Archbishop Leopoldo Teofili (born , died ) Archbishop of Lanciano e Ortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAtri

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast