Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pio Agostino Crivellari, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trivento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1906Born
23 Feb 192923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
7 Feb 195852.0AppointedBishop of Trivento, Italy
16 Mar 195852.1Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
3 Feb 196660.0DiedBishop of Trivento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pio Agostino Crivellari
Bishop Pio Agostino Crivellari O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Trivento

EventPlace
Birth PlacePadova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast