Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis de La Rochefoucauld

Deceased

Bishop of Lectoure


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1615BornPoitiers
6 May 164630.3SelectedBishop of Lectoure, France
11 Oct 164933.8ConfirmedBishop of Lectoure, France
8 Dec 164933.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lectoure, France
Dec 1654³38.9DiedBishop of Lectoure, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis de La Rochefoucauld:
Bishop Louis de La Rochefoucauld (born ) Bishop of Lectoure

  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 218
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015