Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis de Lascaris d’Urfé

Deceased

Bishop of Limoges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Aug 1636³Born
22 Feb 167639.5SelectedBishop of Limoges, France
16 Nov 167640.2ConfirmedBishop of Limoges, France
10 Jan 167740.4Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
30 Jun 169558.9DiedBishop of Limoges, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis de Lascaris d’Urfé
Bishop Louis de Lascaris d’Urfé (born Aug 1636, died ) Bishop of Limoges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAllegre

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 241
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast