Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René de Rieux de Sourdéac

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Mar 1619AppointedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
1 Nov 1619Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
31 May 1635ResignedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
24 Oct 1648AppointedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
8 Mar 1651DiedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France

MicroData Summary for René de Rieux de Sourdéac:
Bishop René de Rieux de Sourdéac (died ) Bishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon

  • a bishop for 31.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 219
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1619, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015