Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Placide de Baudry de Piancourt, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mende


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹BornEvreux
165626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
4 Jul 167747.5SelectedBishop of Mende, France
11 Oct 167747.7ConfirmedBishop of Mende, France
16 Jan 167848.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France
13 Dec 170777.9DiedBishop of Mende, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Placide de Baudry de Piancourt:
Bishop François-Placide de Baudry de Piancourt O.S.B. (born 1630, died ) Bishop of Mende

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 268
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015