Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Faber MacDonald

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint John, New Brunswick


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1932BornLittle Pond
9 Mar 196331.1Ordained PriestPriest of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
11 Jan 198047.9AppointedBishop of Grand Falls, Newfoundland, Canada
19 Mar 198048.1Ordained BishopBishop of Grand Falls, Newfoundland, Canada
23 Oct 199866.7AppointedBishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada
12 Jan 199966.9InstalledBishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada
9 Sep 200674.6ResignedBishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada
17 Feb 201280.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Faber MacDonald:
Bishop Joseph Faber MacDonald (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint John, New Brunswick

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Sep 2006
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: CB, 21 Feb 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015